Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC v. Norton Shores, City of

Plaintiff: Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC
Defendant: City of Norton Shores and Norton Shores, City of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00018
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Ellen S Carmody
1 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC as to Norton Shores, City of waiver sent on 1/21/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Douglas M. Hughes on behalf of defendant Norton Shores, City of (Hughes, Douglas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wacker Neuson Corporation, Corporate Parent Wacker Neuson SE for Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Norton Shores, City of (none provided) (clw)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
January 10, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Adam John Brody on behalf of plaintiff Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC (Brody, Adam)
January 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4335375 (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Norton Shores filed by Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Koelzer, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC v. Norton Shores, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wacker Neuson Production Americas, LLC
Represented By: Adam John Brody
Represented By: Jeffrey David Koelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Norton Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton Shores, City of
Represented By: Douglas M. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?