Tubbs #292944 v. Jackson

Petitioner: Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944
Respondent: Shane Jackson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944 (mg)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to file objections to Report and Recommendation; objections re #4 due 3/14/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944 re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #4 #5 (mg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #4 by petitioner Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944; (mg)
January 30, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation (Screening) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944 (clw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 that the action be denied; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
January 18, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944 (mg)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tubbs #292944 v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danyale Sharron Tubbs #292944
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?