Machine Repair International LLC v. St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.)

Plaintiff: Machine Repair International LLC
Defendant: St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00026
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.) served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019 (Cornwall, Christopher)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.) (ems)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cornwall, Christopher)
January 16, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Christopher A. Cornwall on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number GR064314; for filing fee (mkc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Machine Repair International LLC (Cornwall, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.) (none provided and filing fee not paid) (ems)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.) filed by Machine Repair International LLC (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Cornwall, Christopher) Modified text on 1/11/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machine Repair International LLC v. St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machine Repair International LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Cornwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Marys Cement Inc. (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?