Valencia v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Felipe Valencia
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 10:1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTION by plaintiff Felipe Valencia to Report and Recommendation #5 (clw)
February 5, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Felipe Valencia (jlb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the complaint be dismissed; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
January 30, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Felipe Valencia (clw)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (kvt)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Felipe Valencia (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (kvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencia v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?