Salisch v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jurgen Salisch
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Altisource, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding response(s) to pre-motion conference request #6 ; response(s) due no later than 3/26/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file a dispositive motion #7 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Williams, Dawn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file a dispositive motion #7 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Williams, Dawn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file a dispositive motion by defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC; (Williams, Dawn)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (Williams, Dawn)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Altisource, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (clw)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Smith, Scott)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
February 6, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Altisource, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC (none provided) (clw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-777 (mkc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jurgen Salisch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E) (Smith, Scott) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (clw).
January 23, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jurgen Salisch in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4346199 (Smith, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salisch v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurgen Salisch
Represented By: Scott Fenton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?