Waldorf et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ashley Waldorf and Ryan Waldorf
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00060
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Staple, Stephen)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Staple, Stephen)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant to respond to complaint extended to 3/26/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Bank of America, N.A. to Respond to Complaint by defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Staple, Stephen)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Rheaume, Thomas)
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen J. Staple on behalf of defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Staple, Stephen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Bank of America, N.A. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 (Derry, Jason)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bank of America, N.A. (jlg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (jlg)
January 24, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Ashley Waldorf, Ryan Waldorf in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4348128 (Derry, Jason)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bank of America, N.A. filed by Ashley Waldorf, Ryan Waldorf (Attachments: #1 Summons to be issued as to Defendant, Bank of America, N.A.) (Derry, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldorf et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen J. Staple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Waldorf
Represented By: Jason Robert Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Waldorf
Represented By: Jason Robert Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?