Miller et al v. Duchene II, et al
Plaintiff: John Thomas Miller and BG&M, Inc.
Defendant: Jay Messner, Inspired Business Development LLC, Ann Duchene, Dennis Duchene II, Jamal Daoud, Chip Neilson, David Briggs, Inspired Marketing, LLC, Doug Sumner, Jeff Gibson, Dennis Duchene, II and Catalyst Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE to attorney Carly J. Tebelman regarding recent filing #13 (ems)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to response to motion #6 filed by David Briggs, Jamal Daoud, Jeff Gibson, Jay Messner, Chip Neilson, Doug Sumner (Tebelman, Carly)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 motion for leave to file excess pages; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file excess pages #10 filed by BG&M, Inc., John Thomas Miller (Nyeholt, Collin) Modified text on 2/20/2019 (ems).
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file excess pages by plaintiffs BG&M, Inc., John Thomas Miller; (Nyeholt, Collin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #6 filed by BG&M, Inc., John Thomas Miller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nyeholt, Collin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Inspired Marketing, LLC (ems)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Inspired Business Development LLC (ems)
February 6, 2019 ATTORNEY Bryan S. Strawbridge ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (jlb)
February 6, 2019 ATTORNEY Darren A. Craig ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (jlb)
February 6, 2019 ATTORNEY Carly J. Tebelman ADMITTED to practice in the Western District of Michigan (jlb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants David Briggs, Jamal Daoud, Jeff Gibson, Jay Messner, Chip Neilson, Doug Sumner; (Ellis, Nicholas)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Darren A. Craig; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2019 (pjw)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Carly L. Tebelman; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2019 (pjw)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Bryan S. Strawbridge; attorney admission deadline set for 2/28/2019 (pjw)
January 31, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #2 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Strawbridge, Craig, and Tebelman (pjw)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (kvt)
January 28, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Nicholas James Ellis on behalf of defendants David Briggs, Jamal Daoud, Doug Sumner, receipt number 0646-4349637; for filing fee (mkc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clinton County Circuit Court case number 2016-11533-CK filed by Jamal Daoud, Doug Sumner, David Briggs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons and Complaint with exhibits, #2 Exhibit B-Amended Complaint with exhibits, #3 Exhibit C-Second Amended Complaint with exhibits, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E-Second Amended Complaint with exhibits) (Ellis, Nicholas) Modified text on 1/30/2019 (kvt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Duchene II, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Messner
Represented By: Carly J. Tebelman
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Represented By: Nicholas James Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspired Business Development LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Cuzydlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Duchene
Represented By: Charles R. Cuzydlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Duchene II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal Daoud
Represented By: Nicholas James Ellis
Represented By: Carly J. Tebelman
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip Neilson
Represented By: Carly J. Tebelman
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Represented By: Nicholas James Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Briggs
Represented By: Nicholas James Ellis
Represented By: Carly J. Tebelman
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspired Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Cuzydlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Sumner
Represented By: Nicholas James Ellis
Represented By: Carly J. Tebelman
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Gibson
Represented By: Carly J. Tebelman
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Bryan S. Strawbridge
Represented By: Nicholas James Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Duchene, II
Represented By: Charles R. Cuzydlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Charles R. Cuzydlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Miller
Represented By: Collin Harold Nyeholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BG&M, Inc.
Represented By: Collin Harold Nyeholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?