MedMark of Kentwood et al v. Kent County Community Mental Health Authority

Plaintiff: MedMark of Kentwood, John Doe #2, John Doe #1, Kirk Lake and Douglas Goff
Defendant: Kent County Community Mental Health Authority d/b/a Network 180 and Kent County Community Mental Health Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00093
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Robert J Jonker
1 Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE re #17 Defendant's Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.2(b) by defendant Kent County Community Mental Health Authority (Lichtenberg, John)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 filed by Kent County Community Mental Health Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Lichtenberg, John)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Kent County Community Mental Health Authority; (Lichtenberg, John)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 motion for extension of time to answer; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #10 or other response #14 filed by Kent County Community Mental Health Authority (Lichtenberg, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #10 or other response by defendant Kent County Community Mental Health Authority; (Lichtenberg, John)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/19/2019 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 4/12/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Catherine Anne Brainerd on behalf of defendant Kent County Community Mental Health Authority (Brainerd, Catherine)
February 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John M. Lichtenberg on behalf of defendant Kent County Community Mental Health Authority (Lichtenberg, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to attorney Aaron Davis regarding recent filing #11 (pjw)
February 22, 2019 SUMMONS returned executed; Kent County Community Mental Health Authority served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 (as taken from #11 ) (pjw) Modified text on 2/25/2019 (pjw).
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Douglas Goff, Kirk Lake, MedMark of Kentwood for Summons in a Civil Action and Complaint (Davis, Aaron)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kent County Community Mental Health Authority filed by MedMark of Kentwood, John Doe #2, John Doe #1 (Davis, Aaron)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 motion for protective order; Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint no later than 2/28/2019; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO #6 Order to Show Cause filed by plaintiffs John Doe #1, John Doe #2, MedMark of Kentwood with certificate of service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Davis, Aaron) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jlb).
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for protective order with certificate of service by plaintiffs John Doe #1, John Doe #2, MedMark of Kentwood; (Davis, Aaron) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jlb).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs to show cause in writing by 2/25/2019 why the Court should not dismiss the John Doe portion of the case against Defendants for lack of jurisdiction ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (clw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kent County Community Mental Health Authority (clw)
February 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thaddeus E. Morgan on behalf of plaintiffs John Doe #1, John Doe #2, MedMark of Kentwood (Morgan, Thaddeus)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Davis, Aaron)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MedMark of Kentwood identifying Corporate Parent BayMark Health Services for MedMark of Kentwood (Davis, Aaron)
February 5, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs John Doe #1, John Doe #2, MedMark of Kentwood in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4355985 (Davis, Aaron)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kent County Community Mental Health Authority filed by MedMark of Kentwood, John Doe #2, John Doe #1 (Davis, Aaron) Modified on 2/6/2019 text (jlg) Modified text on 2/7/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedMark of Kentwood et al v. Kent County Community Mental Health Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent County Community Mental Health Authority d/b/a Network 180
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent County Community Mental Health Authority
Represented By: John M. Lichtenberg
Represented By: Catherine Anne Brainerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedMark of Kentwood
Represented By: Aaron Landry Davis
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #2
Represented By: Aaron Landry Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Aaron Landry Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Lake
Represented By: Aaron Landry Davis
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Goff
Represented By: Aaron Landry Davis
Represented By: Thaddeus E. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?