Dykstra et al v. Spigel Properties, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Hiliary Goddard-Dykstra and Andrew Dykstra
Defendant: S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd. and Spigel Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Ellen S Carmody
1 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for settlement by defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for entry of Agreement) (Van Suilichem, Kelly)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (Van Suilichem, Kelly)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #10 ; Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is due 4/1/2019; additional requests to extend the above deadline will not be favored; counsel shall be prepared to appear in person for a status conference; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (Van Suilichem, Kelly)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice stipulated proposed order #8 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (Van Suilichem, Kelly)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #6 ; the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the complaint shall be extended to 3/20/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Answer by defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (Van Suilichem, Kelly)
February 27, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donald A. Van Suilichem on behalf of defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (Van Suilichem, Donald)
February 27, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kelly Anne Van Suilichem on behalf of defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (Van Suilichem, Kelly)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd. served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 (Westbrook, Theodore)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. (ems)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
February 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Anthony Noto on behalf of plaintiffs Andrew Dykstra, Hiliary Goddard-Dykstra (Noto, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Westbrook, Theodore)
February 7, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Andrew Dykstra, Hiliary Goddard-Dykstra in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4357246 (Westbrook, Theodore)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd., Spigel Properties, Inc. filed by Andrew Dykstra, Hiliary Goddard-Dykstra (Westbrook, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykstra et al v. Spigel Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiliary Goddard-Dykstra
Represented By: Theodore J. Westbrook
Represented By: Scott Anthony Noto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dykstra
Represented By: Theodore J. Westbrook
Represented By: Scott Anthony Noto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & S Shopping Centers, Ltd.
Represented By: Kelly Anne Van Suilichem
Represented By: Donald A. Van Suilichem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spigel Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Anne Van Suilichem
Represented By: Donald A. Van Suilichem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?