Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Mad Bags, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Craig Landes, Jack J Oliver, Mad Bags, LLC and Jack J. Oliver
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Craig Landes served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019; Mad Bags, LLC served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019; Jack J. Oliver served on 3/20/2019, answer due 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (Janis, Ryan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Janis, Ryan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Craig Landes, Mad Bags, LLC, Jack J. Oliver (ns)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is related to 1:19-cv-104 (jlb)
February 8, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4358696 (Janis, Ryan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Landes, Mad Bags, LLC, Jack J Oliver filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Mad Bags, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack J Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mad Bags, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack J. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Richard Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?