Mills v. Lazer Graphics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mills
Defendant: Lazer Graphics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: February 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is rescheduled to 5/2/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 4/25/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 4/2/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Lazer Graphics, Inc. (Kreter, Mark) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (clw).
February 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark E. Kreter on behalf of defendant Lazer Graphics, Inc. (Kreter, Mark)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Lazer Graphics, Inc. (clw)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
February 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Cynthia Mills in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4358936 (Piper, William)
February 9, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Piper, William)
February 9, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Cynthia Mills (Piper, William)
February 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lazer Graphics Inc filed by Cynthia Mills (Piper, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Lazer Graphics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazer Graphics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Kreter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Mills
Represented By: William F. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?