Echols v. Express Auto, Inc.

Plaintiff: Roneca Echols
Defendant: Express Auto, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00131
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Ellen S Carmody
1 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1691
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/13/2019 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 5/6/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Express Auto, Inc. (Frazier, Melanie) Modified text on 4/2/2019 (ems).
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- 2019 03 12 SOS Acknowledgment Ltr, #2 Exhibit 2 -- 2019 03 07 Green Card & Online Confirmation) (Bolos, Sylvia) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (ems).
February 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ian B. Lyngklip on behalf of plaintiff Roneca Echols (Lyngklip, Ian)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Express Auto, Inc. (ems)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bolos, Sylvia)
February 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Roneca Echols in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4367670 (Bolos, Sylvia)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Roneca Echols (Bolos, Sylvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echols v. Express Auto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Teresa Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roneca Echols
Represented By: Sylvia S. Bolos
Represented By: Ian B. Lyngklip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?