Robinson #172898 v. Rewerts
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Darryl A. Robinson #172898
Respondent: Randee Rewerts and Timothy G. Hicks
Case Number: 1:2019cv00134
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 USCA CASE NUMBER 19-1307 assigned to second/successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Darryl A. Robinson #172898 (clw)
March 18, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Darryl A. Robinson #172898 (clw) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (clw).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 25, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Darryl A. Robinson #172898 (clw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (clw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10456; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (mla)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darryl Robinson against Timothy G. Hicks. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson #172898 v. Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy G. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Darryl A. Robinson #172898
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?