Rose #253173 v. Nagy
Petitioner: Jason Richard Rose #253173
Respondent: Noah Nagy
Case Number: 1:2019cv00135
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION by petitioner Jason Richard Rose #253173 to Report and Recommendation #4 (ns)
March 28, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Jason Richard Rose #253173 (ns)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to transfer case to Eastern District of Michigan by petitioner Jason Richard Rose #253173; (ns)
February 22, 2019 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number LN002634 (ns)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF by petitioner Jason Richard Rose #253173 re #1 (ns)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jason Richard Rose #253173 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose #253173 v. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Richard Rose #253173
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Noah Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?