Warren #595855 v. Skipper
Petitioner: Darryl Warren #595855
Respondent: Gregory Skipper
Case Number: 1:2019cv00159
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by certified mail upon Attorney General 3/17/2019 (mg)
March 15, 2019 SERVICE by CERTIFIED MAIL in a habeas action: copy of habeas petition and order to answer sent by certified mail, article number 70112000000177880077 as to the Attorney General; Respondent Gregory Skipper served via regular mail (mg)
March 15, 2019 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas), #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Darryl Warren #595855 (mg)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and brief by regular mail on the respondent and one copy by certified mail on the Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
March 1, 2019 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number KZ003733 (mg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for order for federal evidentiary hearing or the ability to expand the record by petitioner Darryl Warren #595855; (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1) (mg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF by petitioner Darryl Warren #595855 re #1 titled as "Memorandum of law in support of petition for writ of habeas corpus" (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1, #2 Appendix Part 2, #3 Appendix Part 3, #4 Appendix Part 4, #5 Appendix Part 5, #6 Appendix Part 6, #7 Appendix Part 7) (mg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Darryl Warren #595855 (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren #595855 v. Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darryl Warren #595855
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?