White v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sheila White
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., WebBank Corporation and WebBank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Nitzkin, Gary)
April 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: joint status report due by 4/29/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gottlieb, Amy)
March 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cole Vincent Lussier on behalf of defendant WebBank (Lussier, Cole)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bolton, Jordan)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WebBank identifying Corporate Parent Steel Partners Holdings, L.P., Corporate Parent WebFinancial Holding Corporation for WebBank (Moody, Nolan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by WebBank (Moody, Nolan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; WebBank served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 (Nitzkin, Gary)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/5/2019 (Nitzkin, Gary)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 3/22/2019 (Nitzkin, Gary)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER striking answer #7 ; Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bolton, Jordan) Modified text on 3/12/2019 per Order #8 (pjw).
March 8, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nolan J. Moody on behalf of defendant WebBank (Moody, Nolan)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting STIPULATION #4 ; Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s response to Plaintiff's Complaint due 4/5/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gottlieb, Amy)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gottlieb, Amy)
March 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gottlieb, Amy)
March 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Misty L. Peterson on behalf of defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Peterson, Misty)
March 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tameika L. Montgomery on behalf of defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Montgomery, Tameika)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (pjw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC (Bolton, Jordan)
March 1, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4375692 (Bolton, Jordan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 8-1 District Court case number 1813211GC filed, notice of filing notice of removal and proof of service to plaintiff's counsel by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Bolton, Jordan) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson
Represented By: Tameika L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WebBank
Represented By: Nolan J. Moody
Represented By: Cole Vincent Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila White
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?