Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc.
Undetermined: Melinda L. Crooke
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Melinda L. Crooke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (ns)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #6 motion to intervene; Melinda L. Crooke shall be named as an Intervenor-Plaintiff in this case and the proposed Intervenor Complaint accepted for docketing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text on 4/12/2019 per Chambers (ns).
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Melinda L. Crooke #6 filed by Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc. (Brainerd, Catherine)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc. (Brainerd, Catherine)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION STATEMENT by intervenor-plaintiff Melinda L. Crooke (Smith, Glenn)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Melinda L. Crooke #6 filed by Melinda L. Crooke (Smith, Glenn)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to intervene intervenor-plaintiff Melinda L. Crooke by intervenor-plaintiff Melinda L. Crooke; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Smith, Glenn) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (ns).
March 21, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Catherine Anne Brainerd on behalf of defendant Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc. (Brainerd, Catherine)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed as to Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc.; answer due 4/3/2019 (Price, Dale) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (ns).
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc. (ns)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Price, Dale)
March 4, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc. ; none provided (ns)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Price, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbruck Poultry Ranch, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Anne Brainerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Dale Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Melinda L. Crooke
Represented By: Glenn L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?