Galloway #390394 v. Rewerts

Petitioner: Eric Darnell Galloway #390394
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00174
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Robert J Jonker
1 Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper #2 , Deficiency Order #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Eric Darnell Galloway #390394 (clw)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 4/9/2019 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 UNSIGNED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Eric Darnell Galloway #390394 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway #390394 v. Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randee Rewerts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Darnell Galloway #390394
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?