Hitsman v. Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jack Hitsman
Defendant: Precious Grace Kelly, Manuel Menal Strong, Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC, Precious Grace Stephens, Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC, D'Juan Dale Leverette and Jonathan Joel Dimusto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Copy of Default (Entry of) #34 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 34 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Precious Grace Kelly and D'Juan Dale Leverette (pjw)
June 25, 2019 Copy of Default (Entry of) #33 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 33 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (pjw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION for entry of default as to DJuan Dale Leverette, Precious Grace Kelly, a/k/a Precious Grace Stephens, and Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court proposed entry of default) (Rogers, Phillip) Modified text on 6/25/2019 and 6/26/2019 (pjw).
June 18, 2019 Copy of Default (Entry of) #31 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 31 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC (pjw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC and Atlantic Solutions Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip)
June 11, 2019 Copy of Default #29 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 29 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Manuel Menal Strong (pjw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #27 Manuel Menal Strong - Corrected Declaration in Support of Application for Default by plaintiff Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Manuel Menal Strong (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip)
May 31, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss #25 and Default (Entry of) #26 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (jlg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Jonathan Joel Dimusto (jlg)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #11 motion to dismiss; denying #12 motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS returned executed; Atlantic Solutions Group LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS returned executed; Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jonathan Joel DiMusto (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed; Manuel Menal Strong served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS returned executed; Jonathan Joel Dimusto served on 5/4/2019, answer due 5/27/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jack Hitsman re Amended Complaint #8 , Response in Opposition #14 , Response in Opposition #13 served on Precious Grace Kelly, a/k/a Precious Grace Stephens (Rogers, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jack Hitsman re Amended Complaint #8 , Response in Opposition #14 , Response in Opposition #13 served on D'Juan Dale Leverette (Rogers, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jack Hitsman re Amended Complaint #8 on Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (Rogers, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jack Hitsman re Amended Complaint #8 on Precious Grace Kelly, a/k/a Precious Grace Stephens (Rogers, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jack Hitsman re Amended Complaint #8 on D'Juan Dale Leverette (Rogers, Phillip)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in opposition to PRO SE MOTION to dismiss (letter format) #12 filed by Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss (lettr format) #11 filed by Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION to dismiss (letter format) by defendant Precious Grace Kelly; (pjw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION to dismiss (letter format) by defendant D'Juan Dale Leverette (pjw) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (pjw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Jonathan Joel Dimusto (pjw)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #8 (Rogers, Phillip)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Precious Grace Kelly served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; D'Juan Dale Leverette served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC, Precious Grace Kelly, D'Juan Dale Leverette, Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC, Manuel Menal Strong (ems)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
March 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jack Hitsman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4390056 (Rogers, Phillip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitsman v. Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precious Grace Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Menal Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precious Grace Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Solutions Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Juan Dale Leverette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Joel Dimusto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hitsman
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?