Sumic v. IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global et al

Plaintiff: Ermin Sumic
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 1:2019cv00221
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Ermin Sumic (Lemberg, Sergei) Modified text on 4/30/2019; this entry replaces #6 (ems).
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Ermin Sumic (Lemberg, Sergei)
April 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 6/3/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Lemberg, Sergei)
April 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jesse Louis Roth on behalf of defendant IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global (Roth, Jesse)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global (ems)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
March 22, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Ermin Sumic in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4394733 (Lemberg, Sergei)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global, Unknown Parties filed by Ermin Sumic (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lemberg, Sergei) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumic v. IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IQ Data International, Inc./ Rent Collect Global
Represented By: Jesse Louis Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ermin Sumic
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?