CitiBank, N.A. v. Interior Lifestyles, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CitiBank, N.A.
Defendant: James Neihoff, Interior Lifestyles, Inc. and Annamaria Neihoff
Case Number: 1:2019cv00268
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re James Neihoff filed by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #15 , #21 as to all Defendants by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 DEFAULT and JUDGMENT in favor of CitiBank, N.A. against Interior Lifestyles, Inc. (clw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Default Judgment Against Interior Lifestyles, Inc. by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Interior Lifestyles, Inc. (clw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A. re Order on Motion for Alternate Service #16 (Magyar, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #12 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 motion for alternate service; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER accepting STIPULATION #9 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Interior Lifestyles, Inc. (Magyar, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order Ex Parte #12 filed by CitiBank, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 EMERGENCY MOTION for temporary restraining order Ex Parte by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Divorce Decree), #2 Exhibit B (Process Server's Affidavit), #3 Exhibit C (Proposed Order)) (Magyar, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of FIRST MOTION for alternate service on Defendant James Neihoff #10 filed by CitiBank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Process Server's Affidavit)) (Magyar, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for alternate service on Defendant James Neihoff by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A.; (Magyar, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Judgment Against Defendant Annamaria Neihoff by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Divorce Decree)) (Magyar, Mark)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to Interior Lifestyles, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration)) (Magyar, Mark)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Interior Lifestyles, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019 (Magyar, Mark)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Annamaria Neihoff served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019 (Magyar, Mark)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CitiBank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Corporate Parent Citicorp LLC for CitiBank, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Interior Lifestyles, Inc., Annamaria Neihoff, James Neihoff (clw)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Magyar, Mark)
April 8, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff CitiBank, N.A. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4407416 (Magyar, Mark)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CitiBank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Magyar, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CitiBank, N.A. v. Interior Lifestyles, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CitiBank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Neihoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interior Lifestyles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annamaria Neihoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?