Smith v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Mathew L. Smith
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00271
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion #7 to Dismiss filed by Mathew L. Smith (Cotner, Roger)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #6 filed by Mathew L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cotner, Roger)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendant United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Foster, Angela)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed on United States of America, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, United States of America complete on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019 (Cotner, Roger)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ems)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cotner, Roger)
April 8, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Mathew L. Smith in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4407569 (Cotner, Roger)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America filed by Mathew L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cotner, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew L. Smith
Represented By: Roger G. Cotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Angela R. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?