Americraft Carton Inc. v. White Pigeon Paper Co.

Plaintiff: Americraft Carton, Inc.
Defendant: White Pigeon Paper Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00274
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION of dismissal (Jointly Filed) by plaintiff Americraft Carton, Inc. (Abrams, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 3/10/2020; settlement conference set for 6/24/2020 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 7/13/2020 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; bench trial set for 7/28/2020 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 3:30 p.m. on 6/10/19; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/10/2019 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Abrams, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal), Counterclaim #18 with affirmative defenses by Americraft Carton, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian Lewandowski) (Abrams, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal), Counterclaim #18 with affirmative defenses by Americraft Carton, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian Lewandowski) (Abrams, Michael)
April 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert A. Callahan on behalf of plaintiff Americraft Carton, Inc., counter-defendant Americraft Carton, Inc. (Callahan, Robert)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of withdrawal from representation of White Pigeon Paper Company re #16 filed by Anne M. Kindling (clw)
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 Defendant's ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Americraft Carton, Inc. by White Pigeon Paper Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Dupes, Nathan)
April 11, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Anne M. Kindling (clw)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/10/2019 at 03:30 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 6/3/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 10, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #15 , Attorney Admission Letter #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Anne M. Kindling (clw)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Anne M. Kindling; attorney admission deadline set for 5/8/2019; (clw)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of receipt of case (clw)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Kansas, their case number 2:19-cv-02090; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Transfer Case; and granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 4/8/2019. (ydm) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Plaintiff Americraft Carton Inc. (Abrams, Michael) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Exhibit A by Defendant White Pigeon Paper Co. (Kindling, Anne) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of "Exhibit Affidavit" of document #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes ONLY. (tvn)[Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan D. Dupes for White Pigeon Paper Co. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to Remedy Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant White Pigeon Paper Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Summons and Petition, #3 Exhibit Locations, #4 Exhibit Email)(Kindling, Anne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2019: #6 Redacted Exhibit Affidavit) (tvn). [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to Remedy Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant White Pigeon Paper Co. (Kindling, Anne) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Nathan D. Dupes to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4735210.) by Defendant White Pigeon Paper Co. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Kindling, Anne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2019: #2 Ink Signed ECF Form) (gw). [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Johnson County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Request and Service Instruction Form, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #6 Exhibit Amended Notice to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #7 Exhibit Case History)(Kindling, Anne) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Amended NOTICE of Removal of Action by White Pigeon Paper Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kindling, Anne) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 03/07/2019 for Defendant White Pigeon Paper Co. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 02/20/2019. (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant White Pigeon Paper. (Kindling, Anne) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 2018-CV-6759 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4715061.), filed by White Pigeon Paper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Petition)(Kindling, Anne) [Transferred from Kansas on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Americraft Carton Inc. v. White Pigeon Paper Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americraft Carton, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Abrams
Represented By: Robert A. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Pigeon Paper Co.
Represented By: Nathan David Dupes
Represented By: Anne M. Kindling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?