Wegener v. Stephenson

Plaintiff: Allen Wegener
Defendant: Randall L. Stephenson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00284
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Allen Wegener; (clw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #10 Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Randall L. Stephenson (Marcus, Morgan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTED MOTION to dismiss with certificate of service by defendant Randall L. Stephenson; (Marcus, Morgan) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (clw).
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #8 filed by Randall L. Stephenson (Marcus, Morgan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss with certificate of service by defendant Randall L. Stephenson; (Marcus, Morgan) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (clw).
May 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Morgan I. Marcus on behalf of defendant Randall L. Stephenson (Marcus, Morgan)
May 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Deborah A. Lujan on behalf of defendant Randall L. Stephenson (Lujan, Deborah)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Randall L. Stephenson served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019 (clw)
May 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lisa M. Bruno-Herline on behalf of defendant Randall L. Stephenson (Bruno-Herline, Lisa)
May 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Randall L. Stephenson and delivered to US Marshal for service (clw)
May 1, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Allen Wegener (clw)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw)
April 18, 2019 Copy of Order #3 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Allen Wegener (clw)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall submit an application to proceed ifp on the required AO Form 239 within seven days from entry of this order; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
April 16, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Allen Wegener (clw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (clw)
April 8, 2019 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (as taken from #1 ) by plaintiff Allen Wegener; (clw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randall L. Stephenson filed by Allen Wegener (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wegener v. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Wegener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall L. Stephenson
Represented By: Morgan I. Marcus
Represented By: Deborah A. Lujan
Represented By: Lisa M. Bruno-Herline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?