Buck et al v. Gordon et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Buck, Chad Buck, St. Vincent Catholic Charities and Shamber Flore
Defendant: Alex Azar, Dana Nessel, Robert Gordon, Herman McCall and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Petitioner: Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont
Case Number: 1:2019cv00286
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting STIPULATION #49 to extend Plaintiffs' and State Defendants' deadline to respond to Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 49 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #44 by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Smith, Joshua) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (ems).
June 27, 2019 Filing 48 (DISREGARD) LETTER from Clerk to attorney Leslie D. Cooper regarding mandatory electronic filing (ems) Modified text on 6/27/2019; letter was not sent (Leslie Jill Cooper, not Leslie D. Cooper, appeared at the 6/26 hearing) (ems).
June 26, 2019 Filing 47 MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in opposition to FIRST MOTION to transfer case #29 filed by Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Windham, Lori)
June 19, 2019 Filing 45 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #44 filed by Alex Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Bates, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to dismiss by defendants Alex Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services; (Bates, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 43 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Windham, Lori)
June 12, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to response to motion #5 filed by Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Roach Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seyka Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Strachan Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Snoeyink Declaration) (Windham, Lori) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (ems).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying #39 motion for leave to file reply brief ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Intervene #39 filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont (Lonky, Hannah)
June 10, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Intervene by movants Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Reply Brief in Support of Motion To Intervene, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Declaration of Kristy Dumont, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Declaration of Dana Dumont) (Lonky, Hannah) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (ems).
June 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Related Case by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boone, Precious)
June 4, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE TO MOTION to intervene (expedited consideration requested) intervenor-defendants Kristy Dumont, Dana Dumont #18 filed by Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Windham, Lori) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (ems).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/26/2019 at 03:30 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 6/19/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #5 [Proposed] filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Korobkin, Daniel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO MOTION for preliminary injunction #5 filed by Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K) (Smith, Joshua) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (ems).
May 29, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #5 filed by Alex Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Bates, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to transfer case #29 filed by Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Boone, Precious)
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 EXHIBITS re #29 and #30 by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mot to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Def -Intv Mot to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5 - Stipulation, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Gordon v Caruso, #8 Exhibit 8 - Zide Sport Shop, #9 Exhibit 9 - Tu Nguyen, #10 Exhibit 10 - Brown v State, #11 Exhibit 11 - Palmer v Schuette) (Boone, Precious) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (ems).
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Transfer Case #29 filed by Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Boone, Precious)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 FIRST MOTION to transfer case by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel; (Boone, Precious)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #24 motion to stay; terminating PROPOSED ORDER #26 ; the intervention and transfer motions can proceed on the Court's normal schedule without the need for expediting ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to stay #24 filed by Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Harris, Toni)
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion to Stay Deadlines by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Harris, Toni)
May 22, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF in support of MOTION to stay #24 filed by Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Harris, Toni)
May 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to stay by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel; (Harris, Toni)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re PROPOSED MOTION to transfer case #21 filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont (Korobkin, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF in support of PROPOSED MOTION to transfer case #21 filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont (Korobkin, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED MOTION to transfer case by movants Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont; (Korobkin, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems).
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to intervene (expedited consideration requested) #18 filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont (Korobkin, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems).
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in support of MOTION to intervene (expedited consideration requested) #18 filed by Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont (Korobkin, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems).
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to intervene (expedited consideration requested) by movants Kristy Dumont, Dana Dumont; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer) (Korobkin, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems).
May 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William R. Bloomfield on behalf of plaintiffs Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Bloomfield, William)
May 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark Leonard Rienzi on behalf of plaintiffs Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Rienzi, Mark)
May 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nicholas Robert Reaves on behalf of plaintiffs Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Reaves, Nicholas)
May 15, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION adding attorney Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs in the place of Anthony J. Sukkar (Husa Briggs, Elizabeth)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting STIPULATION #15 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadlines by defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Harris, Toni)
April 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher Alan Bates on behalf of defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services (Bates, Christopher)
April 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher Alan Bates on behalf of defendant Alex Azar (Bates, Christopher)
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Dana Nessel served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019 (Windham, Lori)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Herman McCall served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019 (Windham, Lori)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Robert Gordon served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019 (Windham, Lori)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed on United States Department of Health and Human Services, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, United States Department of Health and Human Services complete on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Windham, Lori)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed on Alex Azar, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Alex Azar complete on 4/23/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Windham, Lori)
April 29, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED re #9 as to Jennifer Wrayno due to not being a party to the case (attorney notified) (ems)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Windham, Lori)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 responses due by 5/15/2019; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joshua Sean Smith on behalf of defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Smith, Joshua)
April 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Precious Synott Boone on behalf of defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Boone, Precious)
April 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anthony Joseph Sukkar on behalf of defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Sukkar, Anthony)
April 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeanne Frances Long on behalf of defendants Alex Azar, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Long, Jeanne)
April 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Toni L. Harris on behalf of defendants Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel (Harris, Toni)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Windham, Lori)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 filed by Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (Windham, Lori)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiffs Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Windham, Lori)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Alex Azar, Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Dana Nessel, United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ems)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
April 15, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Chad Buck, Melissa Buck, Shamber Flore, St. Vincent Catholic Charities in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4413741 (Windham, Lori)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Windham, Lori)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Gordon, Herman McCall, Alex Azar, Dana Nessel, United States Department of Health and Human Services filed by Shamber Flore, Melissa Buck, St. Vincent Catholic Charities, Chad Buck (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Windham, Lori) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck et al v. Gordon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Buck
Represented By: Lori Windham
Represented By: William R. Bloomfield
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Buck
Represented By: Lori Windham
Represented By: William R. Bloomfield
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Vincent Catholic Charities
Represented By: Lori Windham
Represented By: William R. Bloomfield
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamber Flore
Represented By: Lori Windham
Represented By: William R. Bloomfield
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Joshua Sean Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Sukkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gordon
Represented By: Joshua Sean Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Sukkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman McCall
Represented By: Joshua Sean Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Husa Briggs
Represented By: Precious Synott Boone
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Sukkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dana Dumont
Represented By: Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Hannah M. Lonky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristy Dumont
Represented By: Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Hannah M. Lonky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?