Doe v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: John Doe, Oudom Xayphannha and Holly Xayphannha
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv00288
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file second amended complaint #16 Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Justice (Cobb, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #11 by Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of Justice (Cobb, Ryan)
June 23, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file second amended complaint #16 filed by John Doe, Holly Xayphannha, Oudom Xayphannha (Asch, Marc)
June 23, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file second amended complaint #16 filed by John Doe, Holly Xayphannha, Oudom Xayphannha (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Amended Complaint) (Asch, Marc)
June 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to file second amended complaint by plaintiffs John Doe, Oudom Xayphannha, Holly Xayphannha; (Asch, Marc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #11 with affirmative defenses by Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Cobb, Ryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed on Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of Justice, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Executive Office for Immigration Review complete on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; United States Department of Justice complete on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit declaration regarding service) (Asch, Marc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States Department of Justice (clw)
June 1, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #11 (Asch, Marc)
June 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Doe (Asch, Marc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Cobb, Ryan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #7 by plaintiff John Doe (Asch, Marc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to attorney Marc A. Asch regarding recent filing #7 (kw)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed on Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Attorney and US Attorney General; served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Asch, Marc) Modified text on 4/30/2019 per #7 (clw).
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff John Doe re MOTION for leave to appear and proceed using a pseudonym #2 (Asch, Marc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (clw)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter to Deputy Clerk re proposed summons) (Asch, Marc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear and proceed using a pseudonym by plaintiff John Doe; (Asch, Marc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John Doe (Asch, Marc)
April 16, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff John Doe in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4414251 (Asch, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oudom Xayphannha
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Xayphannha
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?