Spectrum Health Hospitals et al v. Everest National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Spectrum Health Hospitals, Spectrum Health Primary Care Partners and Spectrum Health United
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00292
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Selection of Facilitative Mediator by plaintiffs Spectrum Health Hospitals, Spectrum Health Primary Care Partners, Spectrum Health United (Oostema, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 12/2/2019; dispositive motions due by 12/30/2019; final pretrial conference set for 6/29/2020 at 02:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; jury trial set for 7/13/2020 at 08:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference; cmo to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Timothy A. Holland counsel for defendant Everest National Insurance Company (Holland, Timothy)
June 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy A. Holland on behalf of defendant Everest National Insurance Company (Holland, Timothy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge ; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for June 12, 2019, before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/12/2019 at 04:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; **Note Change in Judge and Courtroom** (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Oostema, Andrew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spectrum Health Primary Care Partners identifying corporate parent Spectrum Health System (van Stempvoort, Stephen) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (mg).
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spectrum Health Hospitals identifying corporate parent Spectrum Health System (van Stempvoort, Stephen) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (mg).
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spectrum Health United identifying corporate parent Spectrum Health System (van Stempvoort, Stephen) Modified text on 5/9/2019 (mg).
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand (copy of state court filed answer and appearance) by Everest National Insurance Company (Macinoski, Kristina) Modified text on 5/1/2019 (mg).
May 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Courtney Wright on behalf of defendant Everest National Insurance Company (Wright, James)
April 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen James van Stempvoort on behalf of plaintiffs Spectrum Health Hospitals, Spectrum Health Primary Care Partners, Spectrum Health United (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Everest National Insurance Company (Macinoski, Kristina) Modified text on 4/25/2019 (ns).
April 24, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Everest National Insurance Company in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4421307 (Macinoski, Kristina)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/12/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 6/5/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 19-02360-NF filed by Everest National Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Macinoski, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Health Hospitals et al v. Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Health Hospitals
Represented By: Stephen James van Stempvoort
Represented By: Andrew David Oostema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Health Primary Care Partners
Represented By: Stephen James van Stempvoort
Represented By: Andrew David Oostema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Health United
Represented By: Stephen James van Stempvoort
Represented By: Andrew David Oostema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Marie Macinoski
Represented By: Timothy A. Holland
Represented By: James Courtney Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?