Watkins v. CC Teamwork, LLC.
Plaintiff: Carol Watkins
Defendant: CC Teamwork, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00332
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference rescheduled to 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 7/26/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; CC Teamwork, LLC. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019 (Piper, William)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 7/24/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CC Teamwork, LLC. (Ryan, Linda)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by CC Teamwork, LLC. (Ryan, Linda)
June 27, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Linda L. Ryan on behalf of defendant CC Teamwork, LLC. (Ryan, Linda)
June 27, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy J. Ryan on behalf of defendant CC Teamwork, LLC. (Ryan, Timothy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant CC Teamwork, LLC. (mg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
April 30, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Carol Watkins in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4426040 (Piper, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Piper, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Carol Watkins (Piper, William)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CC Teamwork LLC filed by Carol Watkins (Piper, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. CC Teamwork, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Watkins
Represented By: William F. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC Teamwork, LLC.
Represented By: Linda L. Ryan
Represented By: Timothy J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?