United States of America v. Thody et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Walter Eliyah Thody, Daniel Isaiah Thody, Walter-Eliyah Thody and Daniel I. Thody
Case Number: 1:2019cv00339
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to response to motion #8 #15 filed by Daniel I. Thody (Thody, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff United States of America re Response in Opposition #15 (Nunez, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for more definite statement (with Certificate of Service) #8 filed by United States of America (Nunez, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; response to #8 due 6/21/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff United States of America re CONSENT MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #8 until June 21, 2019 #10 , Brief (Related Document) #11 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #12 (Murphy, Edward)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re CONSENT MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #8 until June 21, 2019 #10 filed by United States of America (Murphy, Edward)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF by plaintiff United States of America re #10 (Murphy, Edward)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #8 until June 21, 2019 by plaintiff United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Edward)
June 10, 2019 PRO SE DEFENDANT REGISTERED TO E-FILE; Copy of Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service #5 complete with login and password sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel I. Thody per Order #9 (jlb)
June 6, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File and Receive Notice Electronically #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel I. Thody (mg)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Defendant Daniel I. Thody's Motion for Leave to File and Receive Service Electronically; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for more definite statement (with Certificate of Service) by defendant Daniel I. Thody; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D) (ems)
May 21, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Daniel I. Thody (mg)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically #4 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Daniel I. Thody served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019 (Nunez, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by defendant Daniel I. Thody (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically by defendant Daniel I. Thody; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (mg)
May 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael L. Shiparski on behalf of plaintiff United States of America Local Counsel (Shiparski, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Daniel I. Thody, Walter-Eliyah Eliyah Thody (mg)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel I. Thody, Walter-Eliyah Thody filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Nunez, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/2/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Thody et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Eliyah Thody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Isaiah Thody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter-Eliyah Thody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel I. Thody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Nunez
Represented By: Michael L. Shiparski
Represented By: Edward J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?