Fettig v. St. Francis X Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Annette Fettig
Defendant: St. Francis X Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 1:2019cv00369
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/23/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 7/16/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to complaint #1 , Reliance on Jury Demand and Special and/or Affirmative Defenses and Proof of Service by St. Francis X Federal Credit Union (Milton, Lisa)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Defendant's responsive pleading due 6/26/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint by defendant St. Francis X Federal Credit Union [Attorney Lisa T. Milton added to party St. Francis X Federal Credit Union(pty:dft)] (Milton, Lisa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of St. Francis X Federal Credit Union served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019 (Walker, Angela)
May 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Frances Jane Hollander on behalf of plaintiff Annette Fettig (Hollander, Frances)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant St. Francis X Federal Credit Union (mg)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
May 9, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Angela Walker on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number 0646-4434807; for filing fee (mkc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Walker, Angela)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Annette Fettig (Walker, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fettig v. St. Francis X Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Fettig
Represented By: Angela L. Walker
Represented By: Frances Jane Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francis X Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Lisa T. Milton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?