Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC v. AAA Turf, Inc.

Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: AAA Turf, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #7 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC (McMahon, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by plaintiff/counter-defendant Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC (McMahon, Rebecca) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (ems).
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand , AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC by AAA Turf, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dzuris, Brittany)
June 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donald R. Visser on behalf of counter-claimant AAA Turf, Inc., defendant AAA Turf, Inc. (Visser, Donald)
June 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donovan James Visser on behalf of counter-claimant AAA Turf, Inc., defendant AAA Turf, Inc. (Visser, Donovan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC by AAA Turf, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Dzuris, Brittany)
June 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brittany Burke Dzuris on behalf of defendant AAA Turf, Inc. (Dzuris, Brittany)
June 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nicholas Jay Schwartz on behalf of plaintiff Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC (Schwartz, Nicholas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; AAA Turf, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019 (McMahon, Rebecca) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (ns).
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant AAA Turf, Inc. (ems)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Financial Interest by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marubeni America Corporation for Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC (McMahon, Rebecca)
May 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4441131 (McMahon, Rebecca)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against AAA Turf, Inc. filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons) (McMahon, Rebecca) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC v. AAA Turf, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Jean McMahon
Represented By: Nicholas Jay Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Turf, Inc.
Represented By: Brittany Burke Dzuris
Represented By: Donovan James Visser
Represented By: Donald R. Visser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?