LaPointe et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Andrew LaPointe and Tammie Henry-LaPointe
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00392
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #15 filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association (Sawyer, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association; (Sawyer, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 Index of Exhibits and Ex 3-10 EXHIBIT re #12 by plaintiffs Tammie Henry-LaPointe, Andrew LaPointe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10) (Moran, Valerie)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing as moot #10 motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Andrew LaPointe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Moran, Valerie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #10 filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-16-2016 Order) (Sawyer, Ryan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A.; (Sawyer, Ryan)
May 31, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. (Sawyer, Ryan)
May 24, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Valerie A. Moran (mg)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to respond to complaint; deadline extended to 6/7/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of FIRST MOTION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #7 filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A. (Sargent, Douglas)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Compliance with Local Rule 7.1(d), #2 Proposed Order) (Sargent, Douglas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association (Sargent, Douglas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Sargent, Douglas)
May 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4440432 (Sargent, Douglas)
May 17, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Valerie A. Moran (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Valerie A. Moran; attorney admission deadline set for 6/14/2019; (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee and re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to 13th Circuit Court, Leelanau County by defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association (Sargent, Douglas)
May 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Douglas R. Sargent on behalf of defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association (Sargent, Douglas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Circuit Court, Leelanau County case number 19-10290-CH filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State court Complaint for quiet title with exhibits,Summons, Jury Demand, Ex Parte Motion for temporary restraining order, show cause, and preliminary injunction with brief in support, Exhibits to brief and motion, Affidavit, Plaintiff's request for discovery, Plaintiff's request for interrogatories, Plaintiff's requests for production of document, Plaintiff's request for Admissions, Notice of Motion, Amended Notice of Motion, Proof of Service, Plaintiff's Discovery requests to US Bank, Plaintiff's request for Admission, Court Order for Preliminary Injunction, Civil Pretrial Statement ) (Sargent, Douglas) Modified text on 5/17/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPointe et al v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Douglas R. Sargent
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Douglas R. Sargent
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew LaPointe
Represented By: Valerie A. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Henry-LaPointe
Represented By: Valerie A. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?