Goree v. Michigan Parole Board
Plaintiff: Denver Goree #111992, Jr.
Defendant: Michigan Parole Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv00395
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Denver Goree #111992, Jr. (ns)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10869; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
May 16, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Denver Goree Pris. No. 111992 at Earnest C. Brooks Correctional Facility, 2500 S. Sheridan Drive, Muskegon Heights, MI 49444. (TMcg) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process, Brief in Support, Index of Exhibits, Exhibits A through C, with Certificate of Service by Michigan Parole Board. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A--Amy Moore, Asst to MI Parole Board, US Mail, #3 Exhibit B--Sedore v Campbell (Order), #4 Exhibit C--Sawyer v Lexington-Fayette (unpublished decision)) (Korbakis, Raina) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Michigan Parole Board of Limited Appearance of Counsel, for purpose of challenging effectiveness of service of process (Korbakis, Raina) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Denver Goree re service of case (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
April 4, 2019 FILING FEE Received in the amount of 400.00 by Denver Goree - Receipt No. DET121631 [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (BHan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit the filing fee. Correction due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Mediation Program (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Denver Goree against Michigan Parole Board (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goree v. Michigan Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver Goree #111992, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Parole Board
Represented By: Raina Korbakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?