Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC v. Ephesus Lighting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Defendant: Mike Lorenz, Joseph Casper, Ephesus Lighting Inc., Eaton Corporation, Amy Casper, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Joe Casper and Cooper Lighting, LLC doing business as Ephesus Lighting, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Facilitative Mediator
Case Number: 1:2019cv00410
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss #58 with prejudice and without costs ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 11, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION of dismissal and proposed Order by plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Rolecki, John)
October 21, 2020 Filing 57 CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Terrence J. Miglio counsel for plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Miglio, Terrence)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 motion for modification of scheduling order ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 55 JOINT MOTION for extension of time to disclose expert reports by defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC; (Phillips, Gregory)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying #53 motion for extension of time to amend ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 13, 2020 Filing 53 JOINT MOTION for extension of time to amend pleadings by defendant Mike Lorenz; (Linkner, Adam)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 motion for extension of time to amend; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 51 REPORT of facilitative mediation held 1/9/20; mediation is continuing; next hearing to be held 3/31/20 (Jack, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 50 JOINT MOTION for extension of time to amend (Submitted By All Parties) by defendant Mike Lorenz; (Linkner, Adam)
December 17, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Selection of Mediator in Accordance with the Amended Case Management Order by plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Rolecki, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 48 Second Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #18 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Cooper Lighting, LLC (Phillips, Gregory)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order #44 is granted; discovery to be completed by 9/30/2020; dispositive motions due by 11/30/2020; settlement conference set for 2/16/2021 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 3/15/2021 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 3/30/2021 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 motion for leave to amend ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file Amended Answer to Complaint with brief by defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Redline Version of Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Amended Answer) (Phillips, Gregory)
December 6, 2019 Filing 44 JOINT MOTION for extension of time to Extend Discovery / for Modification of Scheduling Order by plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC; (Rolecki, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 43 REPORT of facilitative mediation held 10/02/19; mediation is continuing; next hearing to be held 11/2/19 (Jack, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Mike Lorenz for First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Linkner, Adam) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (ns).
August 12, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC for Interrogatories, Requests for admissions, Requests for production (Phillips, Gregory)
August 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kristen-Elise Frances DePizzo on behalf of defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC (DePizzo, Kristen-Elise)
August 6, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC for Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Mike Lorenz, Joe and Amy Casper, and Cooper Lighting LLC d/b/a Ephesus Lighting, Inc. (Hofman, Herman)
August 5, 2019 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 128760 as to defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper, Cooper Lighting, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Mike Lorenz (lep)
August 2, 2019 VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 589982 as to plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (lep)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator William W. Jack, Jr ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 8/6/2019 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 8/6/2019 (lep)
July 26, 2019 Filing 38 SELECTION of William W. Jack, Jr. as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Hofman, Herman)
July 26, 2019 Filing 37 Special Appearance and ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #18 with affirmative defenses by Amy Casper, Joe Casper (McPherson, T.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (McPherson, T.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #18 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Mike Lorenz (Linkner, Adam)
July 23, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Mike Lorenz for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Linkner, Adam)
July 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John David Gardiner on behalf of defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper (Gardiner, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #24 with affirmative defenses filed by defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC with Jury Demand (Phillips, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Cooper Lighting, LLC for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Phillips, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC for Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Rolecki, John)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER dismissing as moot #14 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying without prejudice #25 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying without prejudice #28 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: settlement conference set for 9/3/2020 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 10/5/2020 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 10/20/2020 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and brief in support by defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1: Affidavit of Joseph Casper, #3 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Amy Casper, #4 Exhibit 3: Proposed Order) (McPherson, T.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 26 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Rolecki, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendant Mike Lorenz; (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mr. Lorenz Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Unpublished Opinions) (Linkner, Adam)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #18 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Cooper Lighting, LLC (Baisden, William)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER rejecting proposal to adjourn Rule 16 Conference #20 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Limited Appearance and Request for Notice by defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper (McDonald, John)
July 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John G. McDonald on behalf of defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper (McDonald, John)
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) #14 filed by Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - LinkedIn profile of John Chrisman, #3 Exhibit 2 - Article: Mike Lorenz Leaves Ephesus, #4 Exhibit 3 - Article: Eaton's Lighting Illuminates Collage, #5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Kyle O'Malley, #6 Exhibit 5 - Article: Qualite Partnershp with Ephesus, #7 Exhibit 6 - Article: Griffins' Fans Lighting System, #8 Exhibit 7 - Case Study, #9 Exhibit 8 - NGU Sports Lighting retweet) (Hofman, Herman)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER regarding adjourning Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by defendant Mike Lorenz (Linkner, Adam)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Limited Appearance and Request for Notice by defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper (McPherson, T.)
June 21, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of T. Richmond McPherson, III on behalf of defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper for the limited purpose of filing a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (McPherson, T.)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Sales Conference Deck, #3 Exhibit B - Purchase Orders, #4 Exhibit C - Ephesus Fixture Limited Warranty) (Hofman, Herman)
June 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Herman Daniel Hofman on behalf of plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Hofman, Herman)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re of Limited Attorney Appearance by defendant Mike Lorenz (Linkner, Adam) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (ns).
June 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Adam M. Linkner on behalf of defendant Mike Lorenz for the limited purpose of filing a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Linkner, Adam)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting STIPULATION #15 to extend time for Defendants to file response to complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper (Rheaume, Thomas)
June 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr on behalf of defendants Amy Casper, Joe Casper (Rheaume, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 , Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to John G. McDonald and Adam M. Linkner (mla)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) by defendant Mike Lorenz; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Mike Lorenz, #2 Proposed Order) (Jackson, Angela)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time to answer ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 with Brief in Support #11 filed by Eaton Corporation, Ephesus Lighting, Inc. (Baisden, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 with Brief in Support by defendants Eaton Corporation, Ephesus Lighting, Inc.; (Baisden, William)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/11/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 7/5/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re Limited Appearance by defendant Mike Lorenz (Jackson, Angela) Modified text on 5/30/2019 (ns).
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rolecki, John)
May 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Angela L. Jackson on behalf of defendant Mike Lorenz for the limited purpose of filing a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (Jackson, Angela)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney John G. McDonald; attorney admission deadline set for 6/21/2019; (mg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Adam M. Linkner; attorney admission deadline set for 6/21/2019; (mg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Eric Baisden counsel for defendants Eaton Corporation, Ephesus Lighting Inc. (Baisden, William)
May 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Terrence J. Miglio on behalf of plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Miglio, Terrence)
May 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Barbara E. Buchanan on behalf of plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Buchanan, Barbara)
May 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Joseph Rolecki on behalf of plaintiff Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Rolecki, John)
May 24, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #5 sent via U.S. Mail to John G. McDonald and Adam M. Linkner (mg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Cooper Lighting, LLC by Ephesus Lighting Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc, Corporate Parent Eaton Electrical, Inc. for Ephesus Lighting Inc. (Baisden, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc for Eaton Corporation (Baisden, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 1st Judicial Circuit Court Hillsdale County case number 19-296-CB filed by Eaton Corporation, Ephesus Lighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Eaton Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Cooper Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- State Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 5- Casper, Qualite, Eaton Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit 6- Lorenz Consent to Removal) (Baisden, William)
May 23, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Eaton Corporation, Ephesus Lighting Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4445222 (Baisden, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC v. Ephesus Lighting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lorenz
Represented By: Angela L. Jackson
Represented By: Adam M. Linkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ephesus Lighting Inc.
Represented By: William Eric Baisden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: William Eric Baisden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Casper
Represented By: T. Richmond McPherson, III
Represented By: John G. McDonald
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: John David Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC
Represented By: William Eric Baisden
Represented By: Gregory James Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Casper
Represented By: T. Richmond McPherson, III
Represented By: John G. McDonald
Represented By: Thomas J. Rheaume, Jr.
Represented By: John David Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Lighting, LLC doing business as Ephesus Lighting, Inc.
Represented By: William Eric Baisden
Represented By: Gregory James Phillips
Represented By: Kristen-Elise Frances DePizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Miglio
Represented By: John Joseph Rolecki
Represented By: Herman Daniel Hofman
Represented By: Barbara E. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Facilitative Mediator
Represented By: William W. Jack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?