Lassiter v. Western Michigan University
Plaintiff: Maureen Lassiter
Defendant: Western Michigan University
Case Number: 1:2019cv00429
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by defendant Western Michigan University (Bogren, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Western Michigan University (Bogren, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 to extend time to 8/1/2019 to file its answer ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/19/2019 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 8/12/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Western Michigan University (Bogren, Michael)
June 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendant Western Michigan University (Bogren, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Western Michigan University served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Pinsky, H.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Western Michigan University (mg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg)
June 4, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Crystal J. Bultje on behalf of plaintiff Maureen Lassiter (Bultje, Crystal)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Pinsky, H.)
June 4, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Maureen Lassiter in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4453063 (Pinsky, H.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Western Michigan University filed by Maureen Lassiter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Pinsky, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassiter v. Western Michigan University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Lassiter
Represented By: Crystal J. Bultje
Represented By: H. Rhett Pinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Michigan University
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?