Lukasak v. Premier Sports Events LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Lukasak
Defendant: Steve Griffin, Premier Sports Events LLC, Stephen Griffin and Legacy Global Sports LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00450
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to complaint extended to 8/13/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Response to First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 5] by defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (Wilson, Brandon)
July 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brandon John Wilson on behalf of defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (Wilson, Brandon)
July 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants; defendants Premier Sports Events LLC and Legacy Global Sports LP served 7/9/2019 answer due 7/30/2019, defendant Griffin served 7/11/2019 answer due 8/1/2019 (Wilkinson, Mark) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (mg).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Stephen Griffin, Legacy Global Sports LP, Premier Sports Events LLC (ns)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #3 (Wilkinson, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeff Lukasak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2, Bonus Incentive Agreement) (Wilkinson, Mark)
June 12, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Steve Griffin, Premier Sports Events LLC ; none provided (ns)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
June 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jeff Lukasak in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4457585 (Wilkinson, Mark)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jeff Lukasak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2, Bonus Incentive Agreement) (Wilkinson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lukasak v. Premier Sports Events LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Sports Events LLC
Represented By: Brandon John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Griffin
Represented By: Brandon John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Global Sports LP
Represented By: Brandon John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Lukasak
Represented By: Mark S. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?