TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC et al

Plaintiff: TCF INVENTORY FINANCE, INC.
Defendant: Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC and Connie Susan Craft
Case Number: 1:2019cv00453
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: absent an answer or other responsive pleading, Plaintiff shall, not later than 8/21/2019, move for an entry of default against Defendant Connie Susan Craft or show cause in writing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service regarding Order #31 upon Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC served/executed on 7/19/2019 (pjw); Modified text on 7/22/2019 (pjw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. re Order on Motion for Delivery of Possession of Property, Order on Proposed Order, #31 (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 34 BOND in the amount of $1,200,000.00 entered pursuant to Order #31 (jlg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE regarding Bond by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (pjw).
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC (pjw)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #3 verified motion for possession pending final judgment; cancelling 7/25/2019 motion hearing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Possession Pending Final Judgment by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #24 for Entry of Default by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #26 motion for immediate order granting plaintiff's motion for possession and granting plaintiff possession of its collateral pending final judgment; Plaintiff's proposed order due not later than 9 a.m. on July 15, 2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Order #26 Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Possession filed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Possession by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.; (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. re MOTION to expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Verified Motion for Possession Pending Final Judgment #8 , Brief in Support of a Motion, #15 , Order on Motion for Alternate Service #22 , complaint #1 , MOTION for delivery of possession of property Pending Final Judgment, Verified #3 , Order #19 , MOTION for reconsideration re #9 #14 , Order on Motion to Expedite, #9 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration #17 (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (pjw).
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. re Order #19 (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 motion for alternate service; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Alternate Service #20 filed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for alternate service by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 2) (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (pjw).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Granting Pre-hearing Relief by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #14 motion for reconsideration; Plaintiff shall, not later than 9:00 a.m. on 7/2/2019, file a proposed order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019 (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION for reconsideration re #9 #14 filed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for reconsideration re #9 by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.; (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to attorney Ryan Kauffman regarding recent filing #10 , #12 (pjw)
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS returned executed; Connie Susan Craft served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019 (as taken from #12 ) (pjw) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (pjw).
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS returned executed; Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019 (as taken from #10 ) (pjw) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (pjw).
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. re complaint #1 , MOTION for delivery of possession of property Pending Final Judgment, Verified #3 , Summons Issued #7 , Order on Motion to Expedite, #9 by certified mail (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. re Order on Motion to Expedite, #9 by personal service (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. re complaint #1 , MOTION for delivery of possession of property Pending Final Judgment, Verified #3 , Summons Issued #7 by personal service (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 motion to expedite; motion hearing re: #3 set for July 25, 2019 at 10:00 am before the Hon. Janet T. Neff, 110 Michigan St., N.W., Suite 410, Grand Rapids, Michigan; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 EX PARTE MOTION to request expedited consideration of Plaintiff's verified motion for possession pending final judgment with memorandum in support by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (pjw).
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Connie Susan Craft, Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC (pjw)
June 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4458603 (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Kauffman, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Connie Susan Craft, Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC (none provided and fee due) (pjw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER regarding setting hearing on motion for possession and restraining alienation of collateral by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (kvt).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 (VERIFIED) MOTION for delivery of possession of property pending final judgment with Memorandum in Support by plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.; (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (kvt) and (pjw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (kvt).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Kauffman, Ryan) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (kvt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes of West Michigan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Susan Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCF INVENTORY FINANCE, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Kenneth Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?