Main Credit Corp. v. Holland Opco II, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Main Credit Corp.
Defendant: Kalamazoo Opco II, LLC and Holland Opco II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00457
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/21/2019 at 02:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 8/16/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kalamazoo Opco II, LLC (Perdue, Edward)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Holland Opco II, LLC (Perdue, Edward)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by Holland Opco II, LLC, Kalamazoo Opco II, LLC (Perdue, Edward)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended to Reflect Correct Court by Main Credit Corp; this entry replaces #5 (Carter, William) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (pjw).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Main Credit Corp. (Carter, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Holland Opco II, LLC, Kalamazoo Opco II, LLC (pjw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (pjw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Carter, William)
June 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Main Credit Corp. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4458770 (Carter, William)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Main Credit Corp. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 Holland Opco Contract, #3 Exhibit 2 Kalamazoo Opco Contract, #4 Exhibit 3 Loan and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 Payment Agreement) (Carter, William) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Credit Corp. v. Holland Opco II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Credit Corp.
Represented By: William Kent Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalamazoo Opco II, LLC
Represented By: Edward P. Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland Opco II, LLC
Represented By: Edward P. Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?