Brett and Paula Lemmen Family Trust v. The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brett and Paula Lemmen Family Trust
Defendant: AJ Gallagher & Company, Inc. and The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00458
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER requiring closing documents to be submitted by 8/2/2019; the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 is adjourned ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Joint) (Lintemuth, Elisa)
June 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Frank Anthony Dame, Jr on behalf of defendant AJ Gallagher & Company, Inc. (Dame, Frank)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/9/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 8/2/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting STIPULATION #2 for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT FILE received from 20th Circuit Court, Ottawa County (Attachments: #1 State Court Document(s) - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Document(s) - Docket Sheet) (clw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. (Chapnick, Michele)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. (Chapnick, Michele)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AJ Gallagher & Company, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by defendant AJ Gallagher & Company, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa)
June 12, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Elisa Jean Lintemuth on behalf of defendant AJ Gallagher & Company, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa)
June 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4458759 (Chapnick, Michele)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Circuit Court case number 19-5760-CZ filed by The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certified Policy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Connecticut listing for Standard Fire, #5 Exhibit 4 - Delaware listing for AJ Gallagher, #6 Exhibit 5 - Illinois listing for AJ Gallagher, #7 Exhibit 6 - Email from Lintemuth) (Chapnick, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brett and Paula Lemmen Family Trust v. The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ Gallagher & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Elisa Jean Lintemuth
Represented By: Frank Anthony Dame, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michele A. Chapnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett and Paula Lemmen Family Trust
Represented By: James Alexander Marek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?