Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Nilfisk, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Alkota Cleaning Systems, Inc. and Nilfisk, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00481
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Citizens Insurance Company of America (Moss, Bruce)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file responsive pleadings as to Defendant Nilfisk, Inc.; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #5 ; Defendant Alkota Cleaning Systems, Inc.'s answer or response to the complaint due 7/15/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file Responsive Pleadings by defendant Nilfisk, Inc. ; (Stanczyk, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Nilfisk, Inc. (Stanczyk, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Answer Due Date by defendant Alkota Cleaning Systems, Inc. (Kalamaros, Philip)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Alkota Cleaning Systems, Inc. (Kalamaros, Philip) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (ems).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nilfisk, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nilfisk U.S. Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Nilfisk A/S, Corporate Parent Nilfisk Holding A/S for Nilfisk, Inc. (Stanczyk, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
June 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Nilfisk, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4463186 (Stanczyk, Matthew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit Court case number 19-034899-NZ filed by Nilfisk, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stanczyk, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Nilfisk, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alkota Cleaning Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Philip E. Kalamaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nilfisk, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew John Stanczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bruce N. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?