Upchurch v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Upchurch
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00502
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO Defendants' 3rd Reqests to Admit filed by plaintiff Stephanie Upchurch (Sukup, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/28/2020; ADR deadline 3/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 4/30/2020; settlement conference set for 12/1/2020 at 09:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 1/4/2021 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 1/26/2021 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Sukup, Joseph)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiff Stephanie Upchurch for Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories and Request to Admit (Sukup, Joseph)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 8/14/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. for JB Hunt Transport Inc.'s Second Request to Admit and First Request for Production of Documents (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Discharging Show Cause ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by defendant J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF MAILING by plaintiff Stephanie Upchurch for Answers to J.B. Hunt's Interrogatories and Requests to Admit (Sukup, Joseph)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing as moot #6 motion to compel; granting STIPULATION #9 ; CANCELLING the motion hearing set for 7/12/2019, at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Disposing of J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Interrogatories by defendant J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Requests to Admit to Stephanie Upchurch (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number #6 : responses due by 7/11/2019; motion hearing is set for 7/12/2019 at 10:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green;(Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
July 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING EMERGENCY MOTION to compel Plaintiff to Answer J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Interrogatories #6 to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION to compel Plaintiff to Answer J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Interrogatories by defendant J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.; (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. for J.B. Hunt's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, and Answers to Plaintiff's Insurance Interrogatories and Notice to Produce Insurance Documents (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: J.B. Hunt Transport to show cause on or before 7/18/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent JB Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
June 24, 2019 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses as taken from #1 , Exhibit B by J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (mg)
June 24, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant J. B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4468400 (Beckwith, Dirk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalamazoo County Circuit Court case number 19-0204-NI filed by J. B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Request to Admit, #3 Exhibit B-State Court Documents (Summons, Complaint w/Jury demand, Answer by JB Hunt with affirmative defenses, Civil scheduling order) #4 Exhibit C- Affidavit by Darren Mulford) (Beckwith, Dirk) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upchurch v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Upchurch
Represented By: Joseph Sukup
Represented By: Jeremy Tiedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Dirk H. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?