Tillerman Seeds, LLC et al v. Tillerman & Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: D.F. Seeds, LLC, Legacy Seeds LLC, Tillerman Seeds LLC, Legacy Seeds, LLC and Tillerman Seeds, LLC
Defendant: Philip Blanchard, Tillerman & Co., LLC and Remos Lenio
Case Number: 1:2019cv00529
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #10 filed by Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC; (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 12, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Shirin Savliwala Goyal on behalf of defendants Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC (Goyal, Shirin)
August 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nicholas Benjamin Gorga on behalf of defendants Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC (Gorga, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/15/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/8/2019; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Joint by defendants Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC (Bedoya, Gabriel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tillerman & Co., LLC (Bedoya, Gabriel)
August 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gabriel Esteban Bedoya on behalf of defendants Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC (Bedoya, Gabriel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Philip Blanchard, Remos Lenio, Tillerman & Co., LLC (mg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bundy, Kerry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiff's, identifying no corporate parents for Tillerman Seeds LLS; identifying Corporate Parent Tillerman Seeds LLC for Legacy Seeds LLC, and identifying Corporate Parent Tillerman Seeds, LLC for D.F. Seeds, LLC (Bundy, Kerry) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (mg).
July 2, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Tillerman Seeds LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4476100 (Bundy, Kerry)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Tillerman Seeds LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Bundy, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillerman Seeds, LLC et al v. Tillerman & Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Blanchard
Represented By: Shirin Savliwala Goyal
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Gabriel Esteban Bedoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tillerman & Co., LLC
Represented By: Shirin Savliwala Goyal
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Gabriel Esteban Bedoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remos Lenio
Represented By: Shirin Savliwala Goyal
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Gabriel Esteban Bedoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.F. Seeds, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Lou Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Seeds LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tillerman Seeds LLC
Represented By: Kerry Lou Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Seeds, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Lou Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tillerman Seeds, LLC
Represented By: Kerry Lou Bundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?