Averett v. Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendy Averett
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00530
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Allied Van Lines Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure by defendant Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Rule 26(a)(1) by plaintiff Wendy Averett (Sininger, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Selection of Facilitative Mediator by plaintiff Wendy Averett (Sininger, William)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 12/31/2019; dispositive motions due by 1/31/2020; settlement conference set for 8/5/2020 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 9/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; jury trial set for 9/22/2020 at 09:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Proceedings Not Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for the same date and time before Judge Janet T. Neff: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT FILE received from Ottawa County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Summons, #2 Attachment 2 - Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment 3 - Docket Entries) (clw)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 7/24/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (ns).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allied Van Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SIRVA, Inc. for Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
July 3, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Dirk H. Beckwith on behalf of defendant, receipt number 0646-4476461; for filing fee (mkc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ottawa County Circuit Court case number 19-5789-CK filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Averett v. Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Averett
Represented By: William R. Sininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Dirk H. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?