EBW Electronics, Inc. v. Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Plaintiff: EBW Electronics, Inc.
Defendant: Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Ottawa County Circuit Court (pjw)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION of remand #6 ; remanding this action to the Ottawa County Circuit Court; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Remand by plaintiff EBW Electronics, Inc. (Breay, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking answer #4 ; Defendant shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint by Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Hilderley, Brian) Modified text on 7/22/2019; stricken per Order #5 (pjw).
July 19, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4487502 (Hilderley, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Defendant shall, not later than 7/23/2019, submit the filing fee or move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; placing Defendant on notice; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (pjw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ottawa County Circuit Court case number 19 5749 CB with Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (incorporated in Notice of Removal), State Court Summons, Complaint and Amended Complaint filed by Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC (Hilderley, Brian) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EBW Electronics, Inc. v. Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBW Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Breay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualite Sports Lighting, LLC
Represented By: Brian Theodore Hilderley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?