Bick v. Bristol-Myers Squibb
Plaintiff: Nathan Bick
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb
Case Number: 1:2019cv00602
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Northern District of Florida, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 3:19-cv-03366 (jlg)
August 30, 2019 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Florida (clw)
August 30, 2019 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (Certified) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (clw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of Florida; case transferred to Northern District of Florida under MDL No. 2734, IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (clw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of Florida regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2734, IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (clw)
July 30, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (mg)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 26, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (mg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
July 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb and returned to plaintiff at counter (mg) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (mg).
July 25, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number KZ003903; for Filing fee (mg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol-Myers Squibb filed by Nathan Bick (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bick v. Bristol-Myers Squibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?