Cain #490544 v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Cain #490544
Defendant: Carmen Palmer and Gregory Skipper
Case Number: 1:2019cv00628
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $84.21, receipt number GR067904; amount paid to date $84.21 (mkc)
September 23, 2019 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Brandon Cain #490544 (clw)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by October 11, 2019; w/attached Protocol ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (lep)
September 13, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Brandon Cain #490544 (clw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting motion to set aside or vacate the judgment and to amend the complaint #6 ; vacating opinion #4 and judgment #5 ; the Clerk of the Court shall docket the proposed amended complaint #7 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carmen Palmer, Gregory Skipper filed by Brandon Cain #490544 (clw) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (clw).
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to file amended complaint, MOTION for reconsideration re #5 by plaintiff Brandon Cain #490544; (clw)
August 21, 2019 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Brandon Cain #490544 (clw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 (VACATED) JUDGMENT in accordance with Opinion that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (clw).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 (VACATED) OPINION; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (clw).
August 8, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Brandon Cain #490544 (clw)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $52.34 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Carmen Palmer, Gregory Skipper filed by Brandon Cain #490544 (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain #490544 v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Cain #490544
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Skipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?