Osorio-Rama v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Martin Osorio-Rama
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00648
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Martin Osorio-Rama (Asch, Marc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving STIPULATION #8 ; deadline for defendants to file responsive pleading extended to 10/28/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Second Extension to File Response by defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection (Babinsky, Laura)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving STIPULATION #6 ; deadline for defendant to file responsive pleading extended to 10/7/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Response by defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection [Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Ann Babinsky added to party United States Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft)] (Babinsky, Laura)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed on Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Department of Homeland Security complete on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; United States Customs and Border Protection complete on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration regarding service) (Asch, Marc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (clw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Asch, Marc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection filed by Martin Osorio-Rama (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - postal records, #2 Exhibit B - acknowledgement letter, #3 Exhibit C - FOIA case status) (Asch, Marc)
August 13, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Martin Osorio-Rama in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4506283 (Asch, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osorio-Rama v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Laura Ann Babinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Laura Ann Babinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Osorio-Rama
Represented By: Marc A. Asch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?