Shura Casters Inc. v. SST Conveyor Components, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shura Casters Inc. and Shura Casters, Inc.
Defendant: SST Conveyor Components, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00655
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #7 ; Defendant shall have until 10/16/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings and Defenses to the Complaint by defendant SST Conveyor Components, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
September 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brent William Warner on behalf of defendant SST Conveyor Components, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; SST Conveyor Components, Inc. served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019 (Boncher, Frederick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shura Casters, Inc. (Boncher, Frederick)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant SST Conveyor Components, Inc. (ns)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Boncher, Frederick)
August 16, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Shura Casters Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4509728 (Boncher, Frederick)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shura Casters Inc. filed by Shura Casters Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Boncher, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shura Casters Inc. v. SST Conveyor Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shura Casters Inc.
Represented By: Frederick J. Boncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shura Casters, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick J. Boncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SST Conveyor Components, Inc.
Represented By: Brent William Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?