Michigan Republican Party et al v. Benson
Plaintiff: Michigan Republican Party, Hank Vaupel, Dorian Thompson, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Laura Cox and Terri Lynn Land
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: Count MI Vote
Case Number: 1:2019cv00669
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion, (55 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC, 61 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC) filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jocelyn Benson; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
October 10, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY to response to motion (48 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC), (42 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC) filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jocelyn Benson ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
October 10, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY to response to motion (37 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 29 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Count MI Vote ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
October 10, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY to response to motion (33 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 25 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Count MI Vote ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting (55) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC; granting (49) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss (34 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC, 42 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC), MOTION for order of dismissal and judgment(33 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 25 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) and Plaintiffs' Consolidated Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anthony Daunt (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Bursch, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion,, (48 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Gordon, Gary)
October 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Gordon, Gary)
October 3, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss (filed in case number 1:19-cv-669, document number 40)(48 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC), MOTION to dismiss (34 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC), MOTION for order of dismissal and judgment in Case 19-cv-00669(37 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 29 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) and Reply to Defendants' Responses to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Griffin et al v Padilla et al); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Gordon, Gary)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order (52) in case 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC and (46) in case 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC; Dickinson Wright PLLC is substituted in place of Clark Hill PLC as attorneys of record for Plaintiffs Michigan Republican Party, Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, and Hank Vaupel; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 46 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Substitution of Counsel by plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Avers, Robert)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER striking stipulated proposed order #44 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 44 (STRICKEN) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for the Substitution of Plaintiffs' Counsel by plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel [Attorney Robert L. Avers added to party Laura Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Robert L. Avers added to party Terri Lynn Land(pty:pla), Attorney Robert L. Avers added to party Michigan Republican Party(pty:pla), Attorney Robert L. Avers added to party Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci(pty:pla), Attorney Robert L. Avers added to party Dorian Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert L. Avers added to party Hank Vaupel(pty:pla)] (Avers, Robert) Modified text on 9/26/2019; stricken per #45 (mg).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting (41), (47) motions for leave to file excess pages; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #41 filed by Jocelyn Benson (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 41 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss #40 filed by Jocelyn Benson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit of Sally Marsh) (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to dismiss by defendant Jocelyn Benson; (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by defendant Jocelyn Benson; (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #37 filed by Jocelyn Benson (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #2 filed by Jocelyn Benson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit of Sally Marsh) (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (34 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC, 42 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC) , CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, (35 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Jocelyn Benson; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss (34 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC, 42 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC) filed by Jocelyn Benson; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to dismiss by defendant Jocelyn Benson; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by defendant Jocelyn Benson; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, (39 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 31 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Jocelyn Benson; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction (4 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC) filed by Jocelyn Benson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Affidavit of Sally Marsh); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Meingast, Heather)
September 19, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order of dismissal and judgment in Case 19-cv-00669(37 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 29 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Count MI Vote; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for order of dismissal and judgment in Case 19-cv-00669 by intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF by intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote In opposition to motion for preliminary injunction in Case 19-cv-00669 ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction (2 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Count MI Vote ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order of dismissal and judgment(33 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 25 in 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC) filed by Count MI Vote; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for order of dismissal and judgment by intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote; ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF by intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote In opposition to motion for preliminary injunction ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 19, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction (4 in 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC) filed by Count MI Vote ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:19-cv-00614-JTN-ESC, 1:19-cv-00669-JTN-ESC (Crabtree, Graham)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER consolidating cases 1:19-cv-614 and 1:19-cv-669; setting forth briefing schedule regarding motion for preliminary injunction #2 ; setting forth briefing schedule regarding Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by Count MI Vote (Crabtree, Graham)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote (Crabtree, Graham)
September 9, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Paul M. Smith on behalf of intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote (Smith, Paul)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading by defendant Jocelyn Benson; (Meingast, Heather)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant Jocelyn Benson (Meingast, Heather)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #4 motion to exceed word limit; accepting brief #3 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Annabelle Harless on behalf of intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians (Harless, Annabelle)
September 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Graham K. Crabtree on behalf of intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians (Crabtree, Graham)
September 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark Gaber on behalf of intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians (Gaber, Mark)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 unopposed motion to intervene; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to intervene intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians #12 filed by Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians (Kauffman, Ryan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION to intervene intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians #12 filed by Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kauffman, Ryan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to intervene intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians by intervenor-defendant Count MI Vote d/b/a Voters Not Politicians; (Kauffman, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Erik Alexander Grill on behalf of defendant Jocelyn Benson (Grill, Erik)
August 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heather S. Meingast on behalf of defendant Jocelyn Benson (Meingast, Heather)
August 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian D. Shekell on behalf of plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel (Shekell, Brian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Jocelyn Benson served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Gordon, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Jocelyn Benson (ems)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:19-cv-614 (mkc)
August 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Allen Hughes on behalf of plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel (Hughes, Scott)
August 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jason Thomas Hanselman on behalf of plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel (Hanselman, Jason)
August 22, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number LN002683; for Filing Fee (clw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 CORRECTED EXHIBIT A to Complaint #1 by plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel (Gordon, Gary) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (ems).
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Gordon, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michigan Republican Party (Gordon, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for order to Exceed Word Limit for a Brief in Support of Nondispositive Motion by plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel; (Gordon, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in support of MOTION for preliminary injunction #2 filed by Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cox Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Land Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Mucci Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Thompson Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - Vaupel Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - VNP Proposal) (Gordon, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiffs Laura Cox, Terri Lynn Land, Michigan Republican Party, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Dorian Thompson, Hank Vaupel; (Gordon, Gary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jocelyn Benson filed by Hank Vaupel, Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci, Michigan Republican Party, Terri Lynn Land, Laura Cox, Dorian Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons) (Gordon, Gary) Modified text on 8/22/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michigan Republican Party et al v. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michigan Republican Party
Represented By: Scott Allen Hughes
Represented By: Brian D. Shekell
Represented By: Gary P. Gordon
Represented By: Jason Thomas Hanselman
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Vaupel
Represented By: Scott Allen Hughes
Represented By: Brian D. Shekell
Represented By: Gary P. Gordon
Represented By: Jason Thomas Hanselman
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian Thompson
Represented By: Scott Allen Hughes
Represented By: Brian D. Shekell
Represented By: Gary P. Gordon
Represented By: Jason Thomas Hanselman
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savina Alexandra Zoe Mucci
Represented By: Scott Allen Hughes
Represented By: Brian D. Shekell
Represented By: Gary P. Gordon
Represented By: Jason Thomas Hanselman
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Cox
Represented By: Scott Allen Hughes
Represented By: Brian D. Shekell
Represented By: Gary P. Gordon
Represented By: Jason Thomas Hanselman
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Land
Represented By: Scott Allen Hughes
Represented By: Brian D. Shekell
Represented By: Gary P. Gordon
Represented By: Jason Thomas Hanselman
Represented By: Charles R. Spies
Represented By: Robert L. Avers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Benson
Represented By: Erik Alexander Grill
Represented By: Heather S. Meingast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: Count MI Vote
Represented By: Ryan Kenneth Kauffman
Represented By: Mark Gaber
Represented By: Paul M. Smith
Represented By: Annabelle Harless
Represented By: Graham K. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?