Ebers Orchards, LLC v. Core Farms LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ebers Orchards, LLC
Defendant: Core Farms LLC and Roger Kropf
Case Number: 1:2019cv00681
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT granting proposed consent judgment #8 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Final Consent Judgment by plaintiff Ebers Orchards, LLC (Bevins, David) Modified text on 10/11/2019 (ems).
October 8, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert F. Wardrop, II on behalf of defendants Core Farms LLC, Roger Kropf (Wardrop, Robert)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Roger Kropf served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Bevins, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Core Farms LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Bevins, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Core Farms LLC, Roger Kropf (ems)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bevins, David)
August 26, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Ebers Orchards, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4517790 (Bevins, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ebers Orchards, LLC (Bevins, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Core Farms LLC, Roger Kropf filed by Ebers Orchards, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Bevins, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebers Orchards, LLC v. Core Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Farms LLC
Represented By: Robert F. Wardrop, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Kropf
Represented By: Robert F. Wardrop, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebers Orchards, LLC
Represented By: David E. Bevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?